Findlay, Brian Peter (CPSO#: 50550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 49300
Fax: (905) 685-3172
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Findlay & Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomas ( CPSO# 32302 )
Dr. B. Findlay ( CPSO# 50550 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Business Address:
Suite 204
1 Belton Boulevard
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (905) 688-2229

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN PETER FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1983