Fink, Jennifer Leah (CPSO#: 89207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5016
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 282-4042
Fax: (416) 322-5432
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Fink Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fink ( CPSO# 89207 )

Business Address:
3080 Yonge street
Suite 5016
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (647) 282-4042

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEAH FINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2016