Finkelberg, Frederick (CPSO#: 32974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 482-6660
Fax: (416) 920-1880
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Finkelberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Weksberg ( CPSO# 31759 )
Dr. F. Finkelberg ( CPSO# 32974 )

Business Address:
303 - 66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 482-6660

Business Address:
Division of Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6386

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK FINKELBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1981