Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Finkelstein, David Mark (CPSO#: 55452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 898-2444
Fax: (905) 898-5558
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Finkelstein ( CPSO# 55452 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Centre
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
104 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 898-2444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARK FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986