Finkelstein, Lorne Stephen (CPSO#: 25560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 608
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 529-6618
Fax: (905) 529-6809
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Finkelstein ( CPSO# 25560 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
Suite 608
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 529-6618

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 04 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE STEPHEN FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1977