Finkelstein, Sheldon Charles (CPSO#: 31280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: P.O Box 35030, 1421 Grand Marais West, Windsor, ON N9E 4V0
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015