Finnie, Keith James Campbell (CPSO#: 31750)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith J. C. Finnie Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014