Firszt, Matthew Shane (CPSO#: 93242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Bay St. Suite 108
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 921-2121
Fax: (416) 929-7316
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial Urgent Care Center
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Firszt & S. Amiel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Firszt ( CPSO# 93242 )
Dr. S. Amiel ( CPSO# 93236 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 921-2121

Business Address:
Clairhurst Medical Centre
Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 531-3331

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW SHANE FIRSZT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIRSZT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012