Fischer, Lisa Kelly (CPSO#: 66391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler-Kennedy Sports Medicine
Clinic, 3M Building
Western University
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Fax: (519) 661-3379
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fowler Kennedy Sport
Medicine Clinic
Fanshawe College
London, ontario
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Canada
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: (519) 452-4415
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fischer ( CPSO# 66391 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Building
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3011

Business Address:
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Phone Number: (519) 452-4230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA KELLY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995