Fisher, Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 65413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 905
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 233-4242
Fax: (416) 233-4233
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6325
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisher ( CPSO# 65413 )

Business Address:
Suite 905
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 233-4242

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6325

Business Address:
UHN
Toronto Western Site
399 Bathurst Street
3A Fell
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5184

Business Address:
105 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 766-1162

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993