Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fishman, Sheldon Brian (CPSO#: 50556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1705
2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2C6
Phone: (416) 489-4411
Fax: (416) 322-9570
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Fishman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fishman ( CPSO# 50556 )

Business Address:
1705 - 2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 489-4411

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON BRIAN FISHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1986