Fitzgerald, Mary Patricia (CPSO#: 63040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Names: Fitzgerald-Douglas, Mary Patricia (used until: 05 Feb 2007 )     Douglas, Mary Patricia Fitzgerald (used until: 02 Feb 1995 )     Fitzgerald, Mary Patricia (used until: 02 Jan 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Finchgate X-Ray And Ultrasound
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-8440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

ETOBICOKE GENERAL HOSPITAL
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416 924 2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fitzgerald ( CPSO# 63040 )

Business Address:
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Bramalea ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY PATRICIA FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992