Fitzgerald, Peter Gregory (CPSO#: 55332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75231
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fitzgerald ( CPSO# 55332 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Suite 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-4941

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1986