Fitzgibbon, Edward James (CPSO#: 73363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Palliative Care Program
Room 5235
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8940
Fax: (613) 739-6182
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fitzgibbon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fitzgibbon ( CPSO# 73363 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Palliative Care Program
5235 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD JAMES FITZGIBBON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGIBBON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1999