Flanders, Tamar Yaela (CPSO#: 75176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midtown Pediatrics
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 489-3273
Fax: (416) 489-1510
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flanders Geagea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Geagea ( CPSO# 74796 )
Dr. T. Flanders ( CPSO# 75176 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health - Queen Street Site
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMAR YAELA FLANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLANDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004