Flannery, John Francis (CPSO#: 63328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Rehab University Centre
Suite 7-141-2
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4502
Fax: (416) 516-6596
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Flannery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Flannery ( CPSO# 63328 )

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Unit 7-141-2
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS FLANNERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLANNERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1991