Fleischer-Djoleto, Albert Ofei (CPSO#: 27771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fleischer-Djoleto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1973 to 14 Jun 1974
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015