Fleming, Angela Dawn (CPSO#: 73621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Radiology
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fleming ( CPSO# 73621 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA DAWN FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2005