Fleshner, Neil Eric (CPSO#: 59628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2899
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Fleshner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fleshner ( CPSO# 59628 )
Dr. E. Rakovitch ( CPSO# 61022 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL ERIC FLESHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLESHNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990