Flood, Diane Alice (CPSO#: 55780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 512
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-3883
Fax: (905) 569-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.A. Flood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Flood ( CPSO# 55780 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Suite 512
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-2882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE ALICE FLOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1987