Fluit, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 81013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Fluit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fluit ( CPSO# 81013 )

Business Address:
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 914-4161

Business Address:
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 914-4161

Business Address:
16 - 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone Number: (613) 228-2882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD FLUIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLUIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013