Foga, Myrosia Maria (CPSO#: 77083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 3465
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Myrosia Foga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foga ( CPSO# 77083 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYROSIA MARIA FOGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001