Foley, Stephen Ronan (CPSO#: 59834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital Site
F2 Room 203
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42074
Fax: (905) 575-2553
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Foley & Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ross ( CPSO# 59680 )
Dr. S. Foley ( CPSO# 59834 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Services
Henderson Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN RONAN FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991