Folkl, Alex Kelsey (CPSO#: 98211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Vermont, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GEMS
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union St. East
Fergus ON  N1M1W3
Canada
Phone: 5198432010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX KELSEY FOLKL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLKL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014