Foote, Margaret Jane Grant (CPSO#: 29883)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret J. G. Foote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 George Street South, Cambridge, ON N1S 2N3
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016