Forbes, Andrew John (CPSO#: 58552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Sidney Street
Suite 2B
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone: (613) 969-1454
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.J. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forbes ( CPSO# 58552 )

Business Address:
Suite 2B
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-1454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989