Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Forbes, Geoffrey George Alexander (CPSO#: 61317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 310
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-6244
Fax: (416) 746-6917
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Forbes ( CPSO# 61317 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-6244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY GEORGE ALEXANDER FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)