Forbes, Leta Marie (CPSO#: 73551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leta M. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Forbes ( CPSO# 73551 )

Business Address:
Durham Region Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 665-2603

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LETA MARIE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003