Forbes, Thomas Lawrence (CPSO#: 62430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton North 6 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3274
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Woodford ( CPSO# 62243 )
Dr. T. Forbes ( CPSO# 62430 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton North 6-222
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS LAWRENCE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991