Ford-Jones, Anthony Eric Andre (CPSO#: 28110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Burlington Childrens Clinic
Suite 103
Units 10 to 14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 634-1311
Fax: (905) 634-7202
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Ford-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ford-Jones ( CPSO# 28110 )
Dr. E. Ford-Jones ( CPSO# 29111 )

Business Address:
Suite 103, Unit 10-14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ERIC ANDRE FORD-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD-JONES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981