Forgues, Marie-Josee Renee (CPSO#: 71698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Plantagenet FHT
179 Old Highway 17
P O Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone: (613) 673-4318
Fax: (613) 673-4480
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marie-Josee Forgues Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Forgues ( CPSO# 71698 )

Business Address:
Plantagenet FHT
179 Old Highway 17
P O Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 673-4318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE RENEE FORGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORGUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999