Formoso, Alfredo Feraren (CPSO#: 31142)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Formoso-de Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Formoso ( CPSO# 31142 )
Dr. R. de Guzman ( CPSO# 27957 )

Business Address:
Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Business Address:
838 Somerset Street
Suite 30
Ottawa ON  K1R 6R7
Phone Number: (613) 680-8380

Medical Records Location

Address: Merivale Medical Imaging 1370 Clyde Ave Ottawa, ON K2G 3H8
Instructions: Medical record location as per above.
Date Received: 06 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 2018