Forrest, Ian Frederick (CPSO#: 58609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 406
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 250-6822
Fax: (416) 250-6830
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Shepard ave suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

13291 Yonge St Suite 401
Oak Ridges ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: 905 773 1599
Fax: 905 773 3515
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Forrest Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2007

Dr. I. Forrest ( CPSO# 58609 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M7Y 7R1

Business Address:
Suite 403
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 751-2934

Business Address:
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Business Address:
Suite 406
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 250-6822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. IAN FREDERICK FORREST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORREST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988