Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Forrester, Dennis Hugh George (CPSO#: 31303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine
2nd Floor
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-7066
Fax: (905) 274-0227
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Credit Valley Hospital
Addiction & Concurrent Disorder
2D Psychiatry Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4402
Fax: (905) 813-2276
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Forrester ( CPSO# 31303 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Valley House 2nd Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4402

Business Address:
333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-7055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS HUGH GEORGE FORRESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORRESTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1980