Forse, Raymond Armour Allan (CPSO#: 63698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C M P A
P O Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: 613-725-1300
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Macklin Forse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Macklin ( CPSO# 58188 )
Dr. R. Forse ( CPSO# 63698 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
395 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-0871

Business Address:
PO Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for medical records may write to the following address: Suite 266 1411A Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Z 1A7
Date Received: 15 Sep 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND ARMOUR ALLAN FORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992