Forster-Gibson, Cynthia Jane (CPSO#: 62113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Genetics Program
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905) 813-4347
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forster-Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Forster-Gibson ( CPSO# 62113 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Genetics Program
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA JANE FORSTER-GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORSTER-GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992