Fortin, Pierre (CPSO#: 74643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fortin ( CPSO# 74643 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4370

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2000