Foster, Michelle Catherine (CPSO#: 71084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boardwalk Medical Centre
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 576-8760
Fax: (519) 576-8768
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Foster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foster ( CPSO# 71084 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CATHERINE FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002