Fox, Allan Joel (CPSO#: 28756)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. J. Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Hospital Department of Medical Imaging 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 03 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014