Francu, Corina Maria (CPSO#: 86991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Universitatea Transilvania, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

314 Central Park Dr.
Ottawa ON  K2C 4G3
Canada
Phone: (613) 728-060
Fax: (613) 728-4286
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Francu ( CPSO# 86991 )

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINA MARIA FRANCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014