Frank, Andrew Robert (CPSO#: 74998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 342Y
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: (613) 562-6013
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew R. Frank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2008


Corporation Name: Andrew R. Frank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Frank ( CPSO# 74998 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Memory Program
Room 261Y
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2006