Frankovich, Renata Jennifer (CPSO#: 67859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medsport Ottawa
Suite 300
320 March Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 2E3
Phone: (613) 763-1510
Fax: (613) 270-0982
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renata Frankovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Frankovich ( CPSO# 67859 )

Business Address:
Medsport Ottawa
300 - 320 March Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 2E3
Phone Number: (613) 763-1510

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
P O Bag 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENATA JENNIFER FRANKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996