Fraser, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 54512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne L. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fraser ( CPSO# 54512 )

Business Address:
Westend Family Care
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987