Fraser, Mary Alexandra (CPSO#: 82690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Fraser, Alexandra (used until: 11 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
Huron St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2311
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

189 St. Marie St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3K4
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-6866
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 80973 )
Dr. M. Fraser ( CPSO# 82690 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ALEXANDRA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007