Fredette, Paul Pierre (CPSO#: 69909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3179 Highway 69 N
Suite 2
Val Caron ON  P3N 1S5
Phone: (705) 222-1888
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Care Walk-In Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-1364
Fax: (705) 521-0729
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2016


Corporation Name: Fredette and Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krawczuk ( CPSO# 58259 )
Dr. P. Fredette ( CPSO# 69909 )

Business Address:
Dr. Paul Fredette - Family Medicine
18A - 3140 Highway 69 North
Val Caron ON  P3N 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 222-1888

Business Address:
Suite 105
1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 566-5151


Corporation Name: Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fredette ( CPSO# 69909 )

Business Address:
3179 Highway 69 North
Suite 2
Val Caron ON  P3N 1S5
Phone Number: (705) 222-1888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL PIERRE FREDETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998