Freedhoff, Jonathan Eli (CPSO#: 73756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
575 West Hunt Club
Ottawa ON  K2G 5W5
Phone: (613) 730-0264
Fax: (613) 730-3883
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Freedhoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Freedhoff ( CPSO# 73756 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
575 West Hunt Club
Ottawa ON  K2G 5W5
Phone Number: (613) 730-0264

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ELI FREEDHOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDHOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001