Freedman, Amy Kara (CPSO#: 69366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St James Town Health Centre
410 Sherbourne Street
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-3980
Fax: (416) 785-2494
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Kara Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freedman ( CPSO# 69366 )

Business Address:
St. James Town Health Centre
410 Sherbourne Street
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3086

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY KARA FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997