Freedman, Dayna Miriam (CPSO#: 73128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-1588
Fax: (416) 281-0939
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dayna Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Freedman ( CPSO# 73128 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-1588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAYNA MIRIAM FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On May 31, 2016, at the Supreme Court of British Columbia, Vancouver, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Freedman, in respect of an incident that took place in September 1999.