Freeman, Jeffrey Maximilian (CPSO#: 53985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler-Kennedy Sport Med Clinic
University of Western Ontario
3M Building
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Fax: (519) 661-3379
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fowler-Kennedy Sport MedicineClinic
Fanshawe College
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Canada
Phone: (519) 452-4253
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Freeman ( CPSO# 53985 )

Business Address:
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Phone Number: (519) 452-4253

Business Address:
Fowler-Kennedy Sport Med Clinic
University of Western Ontario
3M Building
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MAXIMILIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985