Frei, Julia (CPSO#: 96316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC McMaster Children`s Hospital
Div. of Developmental Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73508
Fax: 905 524-5707
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

567 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Canada
Phone: 905-688-1890 Ext. 123
Fax: 905-688-1055
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

KidsAbility Guelph
21 Imperial Road South
Guelph ON  N1K 1X3
Canada
Phone: (888) 372-2259 Ext. 6000
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

NIagara Children's Centre
567 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Canada
Phone: 905-688-1890 Ext. 123
Fax: 905-688-1055
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Frei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Frei ( CPSO# 96316 )

Business Address:
HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Divison of Developmental Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
21 Imperial Road South
Guelph ON  N1K 1X3
Phone Number: (519) 886-8886

Business Address:
485 Silvercreek Parkway North
Guelph ON  N1H 7K5
Phone Number: (844) 264-2993

Business Address:
567 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 688-3550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA FREI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 16 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016